THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 1:49:51 AM
Santiago, Marcia Helena Alves Maciel
CPSO#:
92242
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 May 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Universidade Federal Do Ceara, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
201-1300 Cornwall Rd
Oakville ON L6J 7W5
Phone: 2492090565
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Prince Edward Island
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:07 Jul 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARCIA HELENA ALVES MACIEL SANTIAGO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANTIAGO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 23 Jan 2010
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 24 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 08 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
EL - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 09 Jul 2018
EL - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
McMaster University, 14 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 13 Aug 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jan 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 May 2019 |