skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/06/22 16:57:08 PM

Daniel, Ariadne d'Argenson

CPSO#: 92189

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Apr 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
313 Eglinton Ave W
Twig Fertility
Toronto ON  M5N 1A1 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

17203 103 Ave NW
Alberta Reproductive Centre
Edmonton AB  T5S 1J4
Canada
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Daniel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 10 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARIADNE D'ARGENSON DANIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANIEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2009 to 08 Nov 2009
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2022