THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 6:39:50 AM
Kharal, Aysha
CPSO#:
92176
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Feb 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Feb 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Islamic International Medical College, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1-1304 Commissioners Rd W
Unit 1
London ON N6K 1E1
Phone: 5192042022
Fax: 5192040455
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Feb 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AYSHA KHARAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHARAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Oct 2009 to 12 Jan 2010
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Jan 2010 to 20 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 07 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Feb 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2012 |