THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 18:28:19 PM
Hanna, Albert Hanna Henin
CPSO#:
92174
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Oct 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Oct 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Glazier Medical Centre
Department of Family Medicine
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON L1H 2J9
Phone: (905) 579-1228
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Oct 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALBERT HANNA HENIN HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2009 to 11 Jan 2010
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 12 Jan 2010 to 19 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2011 |