THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:24:14 AM
Kaduri, Pamela Allen
CPSO#:
92168
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 May 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
29 May 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dar Es Salaam, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
100 Stokes Street
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Phone: 4165358501 Ext. 36921
Fax: 416 595 6821
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:29 May 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2009 to 17 Dec 2009
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 18 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 May 2018 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 28 May 2025 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2024 |
|
Active |