THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 10:26:47 AM
Malibary, Husam Mohyedeen Mohammed
CPSO#:
92158
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
14 Dec 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Dec 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2009 to 07 Dec 2009
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 08 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Dec 2010 to 14 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Dec 2012 |