THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 14:30:45 PM
Garavaglia, Marco Maria
CPSO#:
92152
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jan 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: Univ degli Studi del Piemonte Orientale, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
U H N Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anesthesia and Pain
Medicine
McL 2-405 - 399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5118
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:13 Dec 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 17 Nov 2009
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 18 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Dec 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Dec 2018 |
|
Active |