THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 4:44:17 AM
Alahmadi, Majed Dakhel Aide
CPSO#:
92116
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
10 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 May 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:17 Dec 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:17 Dec 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2009 to 27 Nov 2009
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 25 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 Dec 2010 to 25 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 Dec 2011 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 May 2016
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Nov 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Nov 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 May 2014 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2017 |