skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/07/21 7:47:57 AM

Seller, Cathlene

CPSO#: 92102

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Nov 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Stellenbosch, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 08 Sep 2009 to 20 Nov 2009
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 21 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2011