THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 7:31:08 AM
Corrales Medina, Vicente Francisco
CPSO#:
92086
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Sep 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
14 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Catolica de Santa Maria, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
ASB Rm 2-003
Ottawa ON K1V 8Z7
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 10297
Fax: (613) 761-4456
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:15 Dec 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Sep 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Sep 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 07 Dec 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Sep 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Apr 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2016 |
|
Active |