THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 0:45:03 AM
Kukreti, Vinay
CPSO#:
92068
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Sep 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
09 Mar 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Marathi, Urdu
Education: Gorakhpur University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
Department of Pediatrics
1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. V. Kukreti and Dr. D. Mankad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 13 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:17 Sep 2014 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2009 to 09 Oct 2009
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Critical Care
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 10 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Paediatric Critical Care
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Jul 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 23 Aug 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Aug 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2022 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Aug 2022 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2027 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Dec 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Dec 2022 |
|
Active |