skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 31/07/21 2:03:37 AM

Vachhani, Luv

CPSO#: 92051

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Apr 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Apr 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
East Mississauga CHC
7 - 2555 Dixie Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4C4
Phone: (905) 602-7723
Fax: (905) 602-5432 Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Mar 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LUV VACHHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VACHHANI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2010