THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 10:12:48 AM
Mura, Marco
CPSO#:
92049
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
19 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Bologna, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Room E6 203
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6744
Fax: (519) 685-8406
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Respirology |
Effective:03 Jul 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:03 Jul 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2009 to 25 Nov 2009
PEAP - CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 26 Nov 2009 to 07 Sep 2010
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2024 |
|
Active |