skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/07/21 10:11:18 AM

Alba, Ana Carolina

CPSO#: 92035

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Sep 2016
EXPIRY DATE
31 Aug 2023
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Sep 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National University of Cuyo, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Room 6EN-246
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 8193
Fax: 416-340-3719 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Alba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Alba ( CPSO# 92035 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Suite 6EN-246
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective:01 Sep 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 23 Nov 2009
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 24 Nov 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2016 Active
             1.    Dr. Ana Carolina Alba may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Cardiology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Alba
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Alba  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Alba's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Alba's certificate of
                        registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on September 1, 2016.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on August 31, 2023.