THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 5:20:33 AM
Alassaf, Abeer Ahmed Mohammad
CPSO#:
92017
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Nov 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Jordan, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 21 Aug 2009 to 11 Nov 2009
PEAP - CF - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 12 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Nov 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2012 |