THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 15:27:58 PM
Rafilovich, Seda
CPSO#:
92002
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Nov 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Nov 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Tamrazova, Seda Sergueevna (used until: 29 Aug 2012 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Russian State Medical University (RSMU), 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valey and Scarborough Hospita
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON M1E 4B9
Phone: (426)284-8131 Ext. 7446
Fax: (416)281-7082
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:03 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:26 Jan 2017 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SEDA RAFILOVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAFILOVICH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Aug 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 16 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Nov 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Nov 2011 |