THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:58:45 AM
Dominic, Arunmozhi
CPSO#:
91977
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
31 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Mar 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 11 Aug 2009 to 03 Nov 2009
AVP - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 04 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 11 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Aug 2011 to 11 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 11 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 11 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Aug 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2014 to 22 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Oct 2014 to 30 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 13 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Aug 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Aug 2019 |