THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
31/05/23 18:07:35 PM
Rind, Ambreen
CPSO#:
91974
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Oct 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Sindhi, Urdu
Education: University of Sind, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital
Suite E6-004A
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Oct 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMBREEN RIND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIND is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 27 Oct 2009
PEAP - CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 28 Oct 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
CF - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Oct 2011 to 18 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Oct 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2012 |