THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 7:25:19 AM
Naessens, Veronique
CPSO#:
91968
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Sep 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:12 Oct 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 20 Jul 2009 to 23 Aug 2009
EL - Hematology
University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2011 to 17 Nov 2011
EL - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Nov 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2014 |