THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 16:32:35 PM
Mazzuca, Monique Marie
CPSO#:
91960
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Sep 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Sep 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
309-200 Cachet Woods Crt
Markham ON L6C 0Z8
Phone: 9056056745
Fax: 9057382474
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital |
Vaughan |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2019 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MONIQUE MARIE MAZZUCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZZUCA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2009 to 24 Oct 2009
AVP - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2009 to 04 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 05 Aug 2010 to 04 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 05 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 06 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 07 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 07 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Feb 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Aug 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jan 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Sep 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 2019 |