THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:57:16 AM
Bral, Mariusz
CPSO#:
91950
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Oct 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Oct 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Polish
Education: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
58 Goodall St
Dryden ON P8N 1V8
Phone: 8072238201 Ext. 1284
Fax: 8072235149
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Dryden Regional Health Centre |
Dryden |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIUSZ BRAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 03 Aug 2009 to 25 Oct 2009
AVP - General Surgery
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 26 Oct 2009 to 02 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 03 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Oct 2020 |