THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/12/23 9:05:53 AM
Schuenemann, Holger Jens
CPSO#:
91933
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
29 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German, Italian
Education: Hanover Medical School, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
HSC Area 2C
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 24931
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Schuenemann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 14 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:06 Apr 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2009 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 11 Jan 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Sep 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Sep 2023 |
|
Active |