THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 2:32:56 AM
Cooper, Alexandra Blanche
CPSO#:
91926
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Nelson, Alexandra Blanche (used until: 27 Nov 2018 )
Nuttall, Alexandra Blanche (used until: 17 Jan 2011 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Edinburgh, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Cooper Clinic
2300 Princess St
Kingston ON K7M 3G4
Phone: (613) 531-2667
Fax: (613) 542-4407
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:31 Jul 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA BLANCHE COOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOPER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2009 to 23 Oct 2009
AVP - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 24 Oct 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2014 |