THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 12:32:39 PM
Beres, Alana
CPSO#:
91892
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 May 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Timmins and District Hospital, 700 Ross Avenue East, P4N 8P2
Date Received: 11 Aug 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Surgery |
Effective:24 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 27 Jul 2009 to 23 Aug 2009
EL - Pediatric General Surgery
University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2009 to 20 Sep 2009
EL - Pediatric General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatric General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 May 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Aug 2016 |