THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 15:50:27 PM
Khamidbayev, Timur
CPSO#:
91889
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jan 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jan 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: West Kazakhstan State Medical Academy, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
280 King Edward Ave
London ON N5Z 3V3
Phone: 519-691-0100
Fax: 226-636-6113
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TIMUR KHAMIDBAYEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAMIDBAYEV is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jul 2009 to 08 Oct 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 09 Oct 2009 to 16 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 17 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jul 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 2012 |