skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/10/21 6:45:15 AM

Bowden, Gregory Neil

CPSO#: 91871

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Oct 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland Faculty of Medi, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2009 to 24 Oct 2009
AVP - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2009 to 01 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2015