THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:07:37 AM
Mathew, Andrew Luka
CPSO#:
91865
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: 5196633120
Fax: 5196633147
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Jul 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:05 Nov 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW LUKA MATHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEW is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jul 2010 to 14 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jul 2011 to 14 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
CF - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Apr 2017
CF - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 May 2017 to 31 May 2017
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jul 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2015 |