THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 10:28:54 AM
Miranda Hermosilla, Rodrigo Ignacio
CPSO#:
91860
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Sep 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Universidad de La Frontera, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 15 Jul 2009 to 14 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
Queen's University, 15 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2011 |