THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 12:04:06 PM
Khan, Asif Ali
CPSO#:
91842
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Sep 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Sep 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Asif Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 3 2015
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:05 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASIF ALI KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 16 Aug 2009
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Oct 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jan 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2018 |