skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/07/21 14:06:15 PM

Dragulescu, Andreea Rodica

CPSO#: 91812

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Apr 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 09 Apr 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian, Spanish

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Paediatric Cardiology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7239 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatric Cardiology Effective:01 Jul 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Pediatric Cardiology Effective:09 Apr 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Aug 2009
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 15 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018 Active
             1.    Dr. Andreea Rodica Dragulescu may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Paediatrics, Division of  Cardiology, University of Toronto, in
                        which Dr. Dragulescu holds an academic appointment at the rank of
                        Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Dragulescu
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.