THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 23:36:43 PM
Amster, Solomon Lawrence
CPSO#:
91799
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Oct 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
25 Oct 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: American University of the Caribbean, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 206
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON N8N 3T6
Phone: (519) 735-1490
Fax: (519) 735-1730
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Nov 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Jul 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 13 Apr 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Oct 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Nov 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 02 Mar 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Nov 2011 |
|
Active |