THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:08:12 AM
Abd ElMotaal, Essam Ahmed Youssef
CPSO#:
91788
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Benha University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
60 West Dr
Suite 102
Brampton ON L6T 3T6
Phone: 416-518-6423
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site |
Toronto |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:12 May 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ESSAM AHMED YOUSSEF ABD ELMOTAAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABD ELMOTAAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 13 Aug 2009
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 14 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2015 |