THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 5:47:07 AM
Armstrong, Sarah Alice
CPSO#:
91773
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Oct 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Oct 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Upstate Medical Center State Univ of N Y, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
54 Riverview Ave
London ON N6J 1A2
Phone: 5196466000
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:14 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAH ALICE ARMSTRONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMSTRONG is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Jul 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 23 Jun 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Mar 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2014 |