THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 16:19:04 PM
Malik, Khalid Saeed
CPSO#:
91757
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
02 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Nishtar Medical College, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1 HOSPITAL DRIVE
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Phone: 7057432121 Ext. 3084
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:23 Apr 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Jul 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 01 Jan 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Feb 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 May 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Feb 2011 |
|
Active |