skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 09/08/22 21:27:39 PM

Edwards, Wesley John

CPSO#: 91713

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Oct 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Oct 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Tasmania, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Anesthesiology
Critical Care Wing 1401
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8187 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Wesley Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Edwards ( CPSO# 91713 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Department of Anaesthesiology
Critical Care Wing 1401
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8187

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:26 May 2022 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2015
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 May 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 26 May 2022 Active
 Dr. WESLEY JOHN EDWARDS may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.