THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
14/05/24 23:01:02 PM
Shafi, Sharmi Tangia
CPSO#:
91702
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Oct 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Oct 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3227 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough ON M1J 3M5
Phone: 4162614446
Fax: 4162614447
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:22 Aug 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHARMI TANGIA SHAFI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAFI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 08 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 09 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Aug 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 2016 |