THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 9:21:21 AM
Willsie, Cheryl Lynn
CPSO#:
91695
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
CMHA
210 Lochiel St
Sarnia ON N7T 4C7
Phone: 519 337 5411
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHERYL LYNN WILLSIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLSIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 06 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 07 Jul 2010 to 06 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 07 Jul 2011 to 06 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 07 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 07 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2014 |