THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 12:18:27 PM
Neighbour, Helen
CPSO#:
91676
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
30 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Firestone Institute for
Respiratory Health
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 34324
Fax: (905) 521-6183
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Respirology |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:23 Jan 2020 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 25 May 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Mar 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jul 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jan 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jan 2020 |
|
Active |