THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:57:36 AM
Chen, Yu-Jen Ian
CPSO#:
91669
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
31 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: COLL OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE & SURGERY, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Adolescent Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Adolescent Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Dec 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Sep 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Aug 2018 |