skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/10/21 4:45:00 AM

Michalski, Warren Chaborek

CPSO#: 91657

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River General Hospital
835 King St West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: 519-742-3611
Fax: 2897800432 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (905) 744-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

102-187 King St S
Waterloo ON  N2J 1R1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michalski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Michalski ( CPSO# 91657 )

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 742-3611

Business Address:
St Mary's General Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WARREN CHABOREK MICHALSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICHALSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2011