THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/12/23 6:32:51 AM
Maric, Peter
CPSO#:
91647
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of New South Wales Faculty of, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:06 Oct 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER MARIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 29 Jun 2009 to 12 Jul 2009
EL - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2009 to 11 Nov 2009
EL - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
University of Toronto, 13 Nov 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
EL - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
University of Ottawa, 22 May 2012 to 21 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Jul 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Nov 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2010 |