THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 17:05:23 PM
Ashraf, Kaleem
CPSO#:
91630
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: Liaquat Medical College, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5547 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON L2G 5Y2
Phone: (289) 296-4500
Fax: (289) 296-5537
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KALEEM ASHRAF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHRAF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 18 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
AVP - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 May 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |