THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 19:37:32 PM
Amin, Qamar Ul
CPSO#:
91629
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Aug 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: 9054942120
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:20 Jul 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. QAMAR UL AMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 20 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 21 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 21 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Jul 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2014 |