THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 3:49:37 AM
MacKinnon, William Frederick
CPSO#:
91617
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Mar 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Mar 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Ezzat, Tarek Frederick (used until: 22 Mar 2015 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1952 Bay St, DT 5900
Victoria BC V8R 1J8
Phone: 2505191719
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WILLIAM FREDERICK MACKINNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKINNON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Mar 2015 |