THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 7:31:34 AM
Singla, Mohit
CPSO#:
91609
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Christian Medical College, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Congenital Cardioligy Clinic
27-470 Chrysler Dr
Brampton ON L6S 0C1
Phone: (647) 545-4080
Fax: (647) 494-8687
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:05 Apr 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Pediatric Cardiology |
Effective:05 Apr 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:05 Apr 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHIT SINGLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGLA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Apr 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jul 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2014 |