THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 3:12:18 AM
Youssef, George Youssef Ibrahim
CPSO#:
91607
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Sep 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
AVP - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2019 |