skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 04/08/21 18:34:24 PM

Mathew, Beena

CPSO#: 91585

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:Calicut University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Main St N
Acton ON  L7J 1V9
Phone: 519-929-9448 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

400 Bronte St S
Milton ON  L9T 0H7
Canada
Phone: 905 - 876-3843
Fax: 905-876-2486
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. B Mathew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Mathew ( CPSO# 91585 )

Business Address:
Milton Urgent Care Clinic
400 Bronte Street South
Suite 103
Milton ON  L9T 0H7
Phone Number: (905) 876-3843

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Sep 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BEENA MATHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2011