THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/11/23 9:29:34 AM
Hashemi, Bita
CPSO#:
91573
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
06 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Sep 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, French
Education: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Genetics and Genomics |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Aug 2019 |