skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/10/21 11:38:37 AM

Galvin, Imelda Margaret

CPSO#: 91553

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesiology and
Perioperative Medicine
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 2 2019
Corporation Name: I. Galvin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 30 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:28 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IMELDA MARGARET GALVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALVIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 18 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2019