THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 12:08:42 PM
Jafari, Katayoon
CPSO#:
91551
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
11 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 May 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Saskatchewan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematological Pathology |
Effective:09 Dec 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 23 Oct 2009
AVP - Hematological Pathology
University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 09 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology
University of Ottawa, 10 Dec 2011 to 09 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology
University of Ottawa, 10 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Apr 2015
CF - Hematological Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Dec 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Feb 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 May 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 May 2022 |